U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01829-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merino-Guerrero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.