U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01826-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ulibarri
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 02, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.