U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01836-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rousseau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.