U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01837-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Foster
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 07, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 11, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.