U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01825-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Madrid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.