U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01832-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [Minute Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 06, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
January, 2023
  • January 07, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.