U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01833-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baca-Bosiljevac
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.