U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01835-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguirre
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.