U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01839-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.