U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00847-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medrano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.