U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01823-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bustamante
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • August 04, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 12, 2022: [Release from Custody]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 15, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.