U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01723-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 30, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.