U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01817-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Etcitty
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 28, 2022: [Release from Custody]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.