U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01575-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Villela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 10, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 15, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.