U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01869-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Siciliano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 25, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.