U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01682-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.