U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01894-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.