U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01892-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bustamante Aceves et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 22, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 23, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.