U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01889-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rascon-Magallanes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Minute Order]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.