U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01886-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Agustin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 24, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 18, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 27, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
  • January 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.