U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01884-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Marquez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 09, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • March 09, 2022: [Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 04, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 04, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 03, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 02, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 02, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • March 01, 2022: [Witness List]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2022: [In Limine]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.