U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01653-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gamboa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • January 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.