U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01912-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 18, 2022: [Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.