U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01908-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mejia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 22, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • March 15, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • March 08, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • March 08, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 22, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 14, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.