U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01880-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • July 18, 2022: [Release from Custody]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.