U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01903-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovato
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.