U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 08, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 05, 2022: [Reply to Response]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Suppress]
  • July 11, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 22, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.