U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01934-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Release from Custody]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.