U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01927-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 09, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.