U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01931-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion (with Video Streaming)]
  • February 23, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Text Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.