U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01926-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Karamanian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Discovery Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.