U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01924-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gorham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.