U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01929-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cisneros-De La Cruz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.