U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01925-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Campbell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 10, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.