U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01932-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 30, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.