U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01715-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benally
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.