U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01951-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Solano-Leyva
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • September 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.