U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01958-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.