U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01956-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Naranjo-Castro
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.