U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crapo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.