U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • February 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.