U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01831-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franklin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 13, 2023: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.