U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01933-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Begay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 23, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 19, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 06, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.