U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melgar-Melgar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Supplemental Record on Appeal Sent to USCA]
  • October 14, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • September 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • September 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 14, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 19, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.