U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gavaldon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 28, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.