U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01896-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luevano, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 15, 2022: [Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 15, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.