U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01572-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.