U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01935-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.