U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Puccini
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.