U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.